Reddy, Kesava (CPSO#: 59250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kurnool Medical College, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice of Neurological Surgery
644 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1B5
Phone: (905) 521-0061
Fax: (905) 521-9561
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kesava Reddy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Reddy ( CPSO# 59250 )

Business Address:
644 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 521-0061

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
142 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7C6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KESAVA REDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDDY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1988