Reddy, Satti Sethu-Kumar (CPSO#: 51478)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Aug 1989