Redekop, Gary John (CPSO#: 58165)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998