Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Redekopp, Alan Wayne (CPSO#: 53503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Nov 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
309 Park Street
Brockville ON  K6V 6E5
Phone: (613) 345-2841
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
St Vincent de Paul Hospital,Providence Continuing Care Centre Brockville

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., November 21, 2011, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Alan Wayne Redekopp:

            (a)   Dr. Redekopp is probibited from prescribing:

                  (i)   Narcotic  Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                        the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                  (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                  (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food
                        and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27), with the exception of
                        testosterone; or 
                  
                  (iv)  Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines
                        and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled
                        Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.19)
                  
                  (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix 1 to the Compendium of
                  Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] as Schedule
                  "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached [to the Order] as
                  Schedule "B").
                  
            (b)   Dr. Redekopp shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room in the
                  form set out at Schedule "C" [to the Order].  For further clarity, this
                  sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Redekopp has relinquished his
                  prescribing privileges with respect to Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                  Preparations and Controlled Drugs other than testosterone".

            (c)   Dr. Redekop shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice
                  and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of
                  monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the Order.

            (d)   Dr. Redekopp shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully
                  complete the following College course:
                  
                  (i)   Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians.
                  

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Nov 2011
Summary:

On November 21, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Alan Wayne Redekopp committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession in his record-keeping and documentation and in his prescribing of narcotics and controlled 
substances.  
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Redekopp's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      a.    Dr. Redekopp is prohibited from prescribing: 
 
            (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
 
            (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
 
            (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and 
                  Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27), with the exception of testosterone; or 
 
            (iv)  Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and 
                  Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and 
                  Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19) 
 
(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and 
Specialties] is attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached [to 
the Order] as Schedule "B"). 
 
      b.    Dr. Redekopp shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room in the form set out 
            at Schedule "C" [to the Order]. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. 
            Redekopp has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to Narcotic Drugs, 
            Narcotic Preparations and Controlled Drugs other than testosterone". 
 
      c.    Dr. Redekopp shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and such 
            other steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his 
            compliance with the terms of the Order. 
 
      d.    Dr. Redekopp shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete the 
            following College course: 
 
            (i)   Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians. 
 
2.    Dr. Redekopp appear before it to be reprimanded. 
 
3.    Dr. Redekopp pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from 
      the date of this Order. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 21, 2011