Redelmeier, Donald Andrew (CPSO#: 54221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G- 151
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6999
Fax: (416) 480-6048
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Redelmeier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Redelmeier ( CPSO# 54221 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
G - 151
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6999

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD ANDREW REDELMEIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDELMEIER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1985