Redfearn, Allison Lee (CPSO#: 58322)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 31 Dec 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 1996