Redhead, Clint Anthony (CPSO#: 58447)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mattawa Medical Clinic
217 Turcotte Park Rd.
Box 70
Mattawa ON  P0H 1V0
Phone: (705) 744-6000
Fax: (705) 744-6011
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Clint Redhead Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Redhead ( CPSO# 58447 )

Business Address:
Leisureworld North Bay
401 William Street
North Bay ON  P1A 1X5
Phone Number: (705) 476-2602

Business Address:
Mattawa General Hospital
217 Turcotte Park Road
Mattawa ON  P0H 1V0
Phone Number: (705) 744-5511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mattawa General Hospital Mattawa

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLINT ANTHONY REDHEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDHEAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Rotating - Incomplete Information

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2013
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2013
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 31 Mar 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2014

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 May 2013
Summary:

On May 15, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Clint Anthony Redhead committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  
 
The Committee found that it was inappropriate that Dr. Redhead engaged in a sexual relationship 
with Ms X, a former patient, only a few weeks after the end of their doctor-patient relationship.  
 
Dr. Redhead had treated Ms X on several occasions while on call at a hospital. He attended on 
Ms X in person as a patient on five occasions: twice on November 12 and then on December 27, 
28 and 29, 2006.  Dr. Redhead was aware of Ms X's vulnerabilities and he treated her for mental 
illness, which consisted of depression, anxiety, and suicidal ideation. Although the Committee 
did not make a specific finding as to the date of commencement of the sexual relationship, the 
evidence is that the sexual relationship commenced at either the end of January 2007 or early in 
February 2007. 
 
Dr. Redhead also gave gifts to Ms X. He knew that she was emotionally and financially needy. 
The giving of gifts by Dr. Redhead to someone who he knew had such problems, served only to 
deepen her dependence on him and thus exploited her vulnerability and augmented the power 
imbalance between them. 
 
On October 30, 2013, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    Dr. Redhead appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
2.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Redhead's certificate of registration for a period of five (5) 
      months, to commence on October 31, 2013 at 11:59 p.m.  
 
3.    The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Redhead's 
      certificate of registration effective immediately: 
 
      (i)   at his own expense, Dr. Redhead shall successfully complete College-facilitated 
            instruction in Professionalism/Ethics no later than one (1) year from the date of 
            this Order. 
 
4.    Dr. Redhead pay costs to the College in the amount of $25,000.00 within sixty (60) days 
      from the date of this Order. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 21-25, 2011, October 22, 24-25, 2012