Redmond, Mary Linda (CPSO#: 57275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Caremedics McArthur
Unit 103
311 McArthur
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3
Phone: (613) 688-0169
Fax: (613) 749-9446
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY LINDA REDMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDMOND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)