Redmond, Timothy Yervant (CPSO#: 80731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-9321
Fax: (705) 746-7364
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy Y. Redmond Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Redmond ( CPSO# 80731 )

Business Address:
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-9321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY YERVANT REDMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDMOND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2007