Redmond, Wayne Michael (CPSO#: 61684)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Nov 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Nov 1993