Redpath, Stephanie (CPSO#: 87500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2010

Expiry Date:  12 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
Division of Neonatology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3291
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Calum Redpath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Redpath ( CPSO# 87500 )
Dr. C. Redpath ( CPSO# 87517 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa Heart Institution
Department of Electrophysiology
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555


Corporation Name: Stephanie Redpath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Redpath ( CPSO# 87500 )
Dr. C. Redpath ( CPSO# 87517 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Neonatology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Sep 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 28 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Stephanie Redpath may practise medicine only,

                  (a)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of  Ottawa, in which Dr. Redpath holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (b)   in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires on March 12, 2018.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate, with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (a)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Redpath's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (b)   the  Committee  does  not receive an annual report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (c)   when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Redpath's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is issued on  September  14,  2010  and  automatically
                  expires on or before  March 12, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and
                  3 above.