Redston, Mark Scott (CPSO#: 58406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Miraca Life Sciences
Suite 200
320 Needham Street
Newton MA  02464
United States
Phone: (617) 969-4100
Fax: (617) 969-3393

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut
USA - Illinois
USA - Maine
USA - Maryland
USA - Massachusetts
USA - New Jersey
USA - New York
USA - Ohio
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Vermont
USA - Virginia
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK SCOTT REDSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDSTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1990