Redwan, Hani Abdulaziz Suliman (CPSO#: 94807)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 14 Feb 2011 to 11 Mar 2011
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2015