Reece, Cadi Marie (CPSO#: 68779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Summerville Family Health Team
Suite 211
190 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 621-9700
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cadi Reece Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Reece ( CPSO# 68779 )

Business Address:
211 - 190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 621-9700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CADI MARIE REECE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REECE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1997