Reece, Susan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 56862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI The Doctor's Office
2575 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5K 2M6
Phone: (905) 820-3310
Fax: (905) 820-3312
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ELIZABETH REECE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REECE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1988