Reed, Andrew David (CPSO#: 73514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: (613) 548-1374
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew D. Reed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Reed ( CPSO# 73514 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID REED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004