Reed, Melanie Jean (CPSO#: 58152)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 28 May 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Nov 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 1997