Reed, Stephen Charles (CPSO#: 60270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 1994


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
2115 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone: (416) 744-4210
Fax: (416) 744-9792
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen C. Reed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Dr. S. Reed ( CPSO# 60270 )

Business Address:
412 - 2115 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 744-4210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. STEPHEN CHARLES REED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1994