Reed-Walkiewicz, Sherry Lee (CPSO#: 59752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: Reed, Sherry Lee (used until: 10 Jul 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lake Of The Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861 Ext. 2262
Fax: (807) 468-1428
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Outpatient Psychiatry Department
Lake Of The Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
4th Floor
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-9861 Ext. 2574
Fax: (807) 468-1428
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERRY LEE REED-WALKIEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REED-WALKIEWICZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1989