Reen, Bajinder Singh (CPSO#: 54890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Agra University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone: (905) 453-0715
Fax: (905) 453-0972
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Reen ( CPSO# 54890 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone Number: (905) 453-0715

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAJINDER SINGH REEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2000