Reen, Mehar Singh (CPSO#: 51756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: Raina, Mehar Singh (used until: 27 Jul 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Kashmir University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McConnell Medical Centre
Suite 110
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Phone: (613) 933-8990
Fax: (613) 933-8997
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehar S. Reen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Reen ( CPSO# 51756 )

Business Address:
McConnell Medical Centre
Suite 110
820 McConnel Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 4M4
Phone Number: (613) 933-8990

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 03 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHAR SINGH REEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Aug 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 6 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1996