Reeve, Brenda Kathleen (CPSO#: 69353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5508
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brenda Reeve & Dr. Cory Scholes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Reeve ( CPSO# 69353 )
Dr. L. Scholes ( CPSO# 69466 )

Business Address:
The Brantford General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5508

Business Address:
205 - 1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 304-0062

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Aug 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA KATHLEEN REEVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REEVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 14 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 15 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 13 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 14 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2001