Refat Zaki, Maged Sharobeem (CPSO#: 88463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: (519) 822-2170
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Refat Zaki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Refat Zaki ( CPSO# 88463 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGED SHAROBEEM REFAT ZAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REFAT ZAKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011