Refling, Lars (CPSO#: 24702)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 30 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lars Refling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 3 2017


Corporation Name: Refling Braithwaite-Walton Zides Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Advanced MD Urgent Care Suite 125 289 South Pelham Road Welland, ON L3C 3C7
Date Received: 30 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Mar 2017