Regan, Kelly Ann (CPSO#: 55532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus, Emergency
Services, 339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3200
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vannelli and Regan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vannelli ( CPSO# 55572 )
Dr. K. Regan ( CPSO# 55532 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY ANN REGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REGAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1986