Rehaluk, Robert Michael (CPSO#: 63111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Del Noreste, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vanier Centre For Women
655 Martin Street
Milton ON  L9T 5E6
Phone: (905) 876-8300
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2318 Lake Shore Boulevard West
Toronto ON  M8V 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 407-4586
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

661 Martin Street
Milton ON  L9T 3V9
Canada
Phone: (905) 878-8141
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHAEL REHALUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REHALUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1995