Rehan, Muhammad (CPSO#: 96736)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 16 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 23 Nov 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 24 Nov 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 17 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2016