Rehman, Faisal (CPSO#: 72494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
A10-207
399 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3285
Fax: (519) 663-3449
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faisal Rehman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rehman ( CPSO# 72494 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room A10-207
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3285

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAISAL REHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002