Reich, Erin Judith (CPSO#: 90534)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ground Floor
473 Dupont Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1Y6
Phone: (416) 588-1888
Fax: (416) 588-0388
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN JUDITH REICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REICH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011