Reich, Heather Naomi (CPSO#: 71205)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Nephrology
Room 8N 849
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3439
Fax: (416) 340-4999
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Reich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Reich ( CPSO# 71205 )
Dr. K. Katz ( CPSO# 71188 )

Business Address:
Division of Nephrology
Suite 8N- 849
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3439

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER NAOMI REICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001