Reicheld, Susan Margaret (CPSO#: 59441)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Lesmill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 2T5
Phone: (416) 441-7000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Reicheld Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Reicheld ( CPSO# 59441 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
180 Lesmill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 2T5
Phone Number: (416) 441-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARGARET REICHELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REICHELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989