Reichman, William Eric (CPSO#: 88047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2008

Expiry Date:  30 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Jan 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State Univ of New York at Buffalo, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
Department of Psychiatry
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2442
Fax: (416) 785-2464
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 May 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jun 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. William Eric Reichman may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Psychiatry,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.
                        Reichman  holds  a  geographical  full-time  teaching  or  research
                        appointment at the rank of Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements  of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  will  automatically  expire when Dr. Reichman no longer
                  holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

            Note: This certificate is issued on January 25,  2008,  and  currently  has  an
                  interim expiry date of May 30, 2018.  The expiry date of this certificate
                  may be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2 above.