Reid, Brian Scott (CPSO#: 59599)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
186 Albert Street
Suite 104
London ON  N6A 1M1
Phone: (519) 663-8089
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian S. Reid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Reid ( CPSO# 59599 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
186 Albert Street
London ON  N6A 1M1
Phone Number: (519) 663-8089

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN SCOTT REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1989