Reid, Craig Wayne (CPSO#: 59914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 2900
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRAIG WAYNE REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1990
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1991