Reid, Gordon Noel (CPSO#: 51485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 May 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 2900
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon N. Reid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Reid ( CPSO# 51485 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON NOEL REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1987