Reid, Kenneth Ross (CPSO#: 51484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 548-2383
Fax: (613) 549-2902
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ken R. Reid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Reid ( CPSO# 51484 )

Business Address:
Kingston Health Sciences Center
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH ROSS REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1989