Reid, Lauren Emily (CPSO#: 93552)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lauren Reid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Reid ( CPSO# 93552 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 19 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN EMILY REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2016