Reid, Robert Henderson (CPSO#: 42746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 May 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8300 Ext. 52985
Fax: (519) 667-6734
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211 Ext. 2026
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6100 Ext. 64146
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8300 Ext. 52985
Fax: (519) 667-6734
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.H. Reid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Reid ( CPSO# 42746 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8300

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5


Corporation Name: Romsa Warrington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT HENDERSON REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1984