Reid, Stephanie Lynn (CPSO#: 108633)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine &
Pathobiology
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4457
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE LYNN REID shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. REID is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. REID shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. REID is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. REID shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. REID is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. REID no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Apr 2016 to 01 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Forensic Pathology

University of Toronto, 02 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017