Reid, Stuart Edward (CPSO#: 74761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Neurology
Connell 725
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4343
Fax: (613) 548-2314
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Canada
Phone: 705-658-4544
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

273 King Street East
Unit 2
Kingston, ON
Kingston ON  K7L 3B1
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-4515
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sladic Reid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sladic ( CPSO# 74788 )
Dr. S. Reid ( CPSO# 74761 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
273 King Street East
Kingston ON  K7L 3B1
Phone Number: (613) 549-4514

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Neurology
Connell 725
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
JM-5
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Weeneebayko General Hospital
PO Box 34
19 Hospital
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Business Address:
Public Health Unit
221 Portsmouth Avenue
Kingston ON  K7M 1V5
Phone Number: (613) 549-1232

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STUART EDWARD REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2006