Reid, Susan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 57988)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital and
Cancer Centre
Room B3-155
711 Concession Street East
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2617
Fax: (905) 528-9388
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-7543
Fax: (905) 575-7711
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Elizabeth Reid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Reid ( CPSO# 57988 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
Room B3-155
711 Concession Street East
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ELIZABETH REID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REID is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1989