Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Reidy, Bridget Elizabeth (CPSO#: 63174)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 16 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: Murray, Bridget Elizabeth Reidy (used until: 05 Dec 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical College of Virginia, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Dec 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013