Reilly, Douglas Howard (CPSO#: 23291)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1943

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1950 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Nov 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 1992