Reimche, Leanne Dawn (CPSO#: 74721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 May 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
260160 4448 Front St SE
Cal;gary AB  T3M 1M4
Phone: 4039562995
Fax: 4039562995
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reimche Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEANNE DAWN REIMCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REIMCHE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2000