Reimer, Cara Leanne (CPSO#: 79239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232 Ext. 6278
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101


Corporation Name: C. Reimer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )

Business Address:
725 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Business Address:
169 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
76 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARA LEANNE REIMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REIMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008