Reimer, Mark William (CPSO#: 77805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 Old Innes Road, Unit 802-803
Ottawa ON  K1B5M7
Phone: 6133662021
Fax: 6133662025
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rose City Endoscopy
Market Square
2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8Y 1R8
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-4154
Fax: (519) 254-4158
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Reimer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Reimer ( CPSO# 77805 )

Business Address:
Unit 6
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone Number: (519) 957-9730

Business Address:
Suite 802-803
1280 Old Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K1B 5M7
Phone Number: (613) 366-2021


Corporation Name: M. Reimer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Reimer ( CPSO# 77805 )

Business Address:
802 - 803
1280 Old Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K1B 5M7
Phone Number: (613) 366-2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK WILLIAM REIMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REIMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007