Reimer, Wesley James (CPSO#: 69145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospitalist Office
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Blvd.
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Ext. 2130
Fax: (905) 681-4964
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. J. Reimer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Reimer ( CPSO# 69145 )

Business Address:
JBH - Hospitalist Office
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WESLEY JAMES REIMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REIMER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1997