Reinders, Francis Xavier (CPSO#: 68152)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6690
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital Corp
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-3300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. X. Reinders Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Reinders ( CPSO# 68152 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCIS XAVIER REINDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REINDERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001