Reinders, Maarthen (CPSO#: 62490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 115
210 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 7V1
Phone: (705) 329-1223
Fax: (844) 321-8485
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Reinders Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2012


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Reinders Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Reinders ( CPSO# 62490 )

Business Address:
210 Memorial Avenue
Suite 115
Orillia ON  L3V 7V1
Phone Number: (705) 329-1223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAARTHEN REINDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REINDERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1991