Reingold, Maurice Mark (CPSO#: 11182)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1943

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1957 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1943
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Mar 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 1995